|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/1918 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 03/1925 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 12/1929 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 05/1932 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 05/1935 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 02/1938 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 02/1941 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 05/1943 | General | |||||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1946 | 14/01/1946 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 3466 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3505 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1948 | 29/02/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3586 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1950 | 18/11/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22130 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63586 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1950 | 07/12/1950 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1961 | 11/11/1961 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1961 | 01/12/1961 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1962 | 11/01/1963 | 47 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 332 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/1918 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1464 boiler fitted | ||
02/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1918. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
03/1925 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1326 boiler fitted | ||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5332 | ||
03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1925. | ||
12/1929 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 549 boiler fitted | ||
12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1929. | ||
05/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1095 boiler fitted | ||
05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/05/1932. | ||
05/1935 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1284 boiler fitted | ||
05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/05/1935. | ||
02/1938 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3317 boiler fitted | ||
02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1938. | ||
02/1941 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3260 boiler fitted | ||
02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/02/1941. | ||
05/1943 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 3231 boiler fitted | ||
05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/05/1943. | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 14/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3466 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3505 |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3586 | ||
02/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1948. Dep: 29/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3586 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
23/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22130 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63586 |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 07/12/1950. | ||
09/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
14/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22150 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
05/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1961. Dep: 11/11/1961. | ||
27/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
26/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1962. Dep: 11/01/1963. | ||
03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63586 from Frodingham (36C) |