|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/10/1917 | 06/04/1918 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 1507 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1920 | 05/02/1921 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1923 | 22/09/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5333 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1932 | 06/08/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1938 | 19/11/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1941 | 11/01/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 38 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63594 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/03/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 41 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 62 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1951 | 21/08/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1952 | 27/12/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1956 | 05/01/1957 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1960 | 13/02/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/1964 | Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) | Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. | SLS/196406 |
07/06/1964 | Doncaster Shed (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works: D2233, 61104, 63594, 63645/7, 63836, 90717 | SLS/196407 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 333 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/10/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1917. Dep: 06/04/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1507 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/07/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1920. Dep: 05/02/1921. | ||
07/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1480 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5333 |
||
29/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. | ||
05/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3506 | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3594 | ||
23/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63594 |
||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. | ||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. | ||
16/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 21/08/1951. | ||
06/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. | ||
08/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957. | ||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
10/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958. | ||
09/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1960. Dep: 13/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28927 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
21/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63594 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |