Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 334 m/e 11/1911
LNER (1924) 5334   20/12/1924
LNER (1946) 3507   27/01/1946
LNER (1947) 3598   14/02/1947
BR 63598 w/e 10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 51 yrs , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 2/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 15/01/1912
IMM Immingham 06/01/1924
FRO Frodingham 04/09/1934
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1433)
03/01/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1498)
01/04/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1502)
20/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1436)
29/09/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1170)
21/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
16/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1040)
21/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1196)
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
29/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
08/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
30/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
25/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
10/09/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
26/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22263)
04/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22270)
16/03/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22255)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/11/1919 03/01/1920 43 days General
Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1922 01/04/1922 43 days General
Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1924 20/12/1924 120 days General
Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5334
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1926 20/11/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 29/09/1928 92 days General
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1929 21/12/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 16/01/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 21/07/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 29/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1938 29/10/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 08/02/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1943 30/10/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 25/01/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1949 10/09/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63598
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1952 26/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1952 02/01/1953 28 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 04/09/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1956 11/08/1956 1 day Unclassified
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1957 16/03/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1960 14/05/1960 43 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 334
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/01/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/11/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1919. Dep: 03/01/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1498 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 01/04/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1502 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1436 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5334
   
11/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926.    
30/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 16/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
15/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
   
23/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3507    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3598    
27/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63598
   
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
05/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
11/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
16/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22255 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63598 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev