Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 335 m/e 11/1911
LNER (1924) 5335   13/02/1926
LNER (1946) 3508   20/01/1946
LNER (1947) 3600   02/02/1947
BR (Tmp) E3600   17/01/1948
BR 63600 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/111/1911
O4/712/09/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 51 yrs , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 31/10/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/11/1919
DON Doncaster 09/01/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 02/10/1937
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1434)
27/09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1808)
13/02/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1098)
11/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1296)
24/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
05/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
27/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1283)
10/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3382)
12/09/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3658)
14/04/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3672)
07/12/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3685)
17/01/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3695)
01/10/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3687)
22/03/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22331)
29/05/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22324)
11/08/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22323)
07/05/1960 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22316)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/08/1919 27/09/1919 50 days General
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 23/04/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 12/05/1923 28/07/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 13/02/1926 57 days General
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5335
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 01/09/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 20/09/1930 11/10/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 24/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 05/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 27/03/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 10/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 10/08/1942 12/09/1942 34 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 14/04/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 07/12/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1948 17/01/1948 8 days General
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3600
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1949 01/10/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63600
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1952 22/03/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1954 29/05/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1956 11/08/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 22323 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1957 11/01/1958 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/04/1960 07/05/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 335
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/08/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1919. Dep: 27/09/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 23/04/1921.    
12/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923.    
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5335
   
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.    
20/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1296 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 24/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3382 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3508    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3600    
10/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 17/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3600
   
17/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63600
   
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22323 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.    
02/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63600 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev