Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 731 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3874 Week
» 14044 Month
» 291840 Year
» 1176221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 26 m/e 12/1911
LNER (1924) 5026   31/03/1925
LNER (1946) 3501   17/04/1946
LNER (1947) 3577   05/02/1947
BR 63577 w/e 23/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Tue 03/12/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 52 yrs , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to ?, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 16/06/1922
MEX Mexborough 30/01/1924
IMM Immingham 20/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 24/12/1926
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 03/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   03/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1435)
22/06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1746)
04/08/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
21/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1166)
16/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1445)
05/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
05/05/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
19/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
06/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3297)
23/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
19/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3397)
11/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22205)
02/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22130)
22/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22877)
17/09/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22187)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1918 22/06/1918 127 days General
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1920 05/01/1921 82 days General  
Gorton Works 21/04/1923 04/08/1923 106 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1925 31/03/1925 61 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5026
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1927 15/10/1927 72 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 21/03/1929 111 days General
Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 16/06/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1934 05/05/1934 31 days General
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1936 19/12/1936 30 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1939 06/01/1940 42 days General
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1942 23/01/1943 41 days General
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1945 19/05/1945 47 days General
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1947 16/11/1947 42 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1949 23/07/1949 33 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 63577
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1949 25/08/1949 20 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/10/1950 09/12/1950 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/06/1951 11/08/1951 50 days General
Boiler number 22205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1953 02/05/1953 28 days General
Boiler number 22130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1953 16/05/1953 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/08/1955 22/10/1955 58 days General
Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1957 16/11/1957 55 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 17/08/1960 17/09/1960 32 days General
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1960 01/10/1960 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/06/1961 19/08/1961 58 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 26
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1918. Dep: 22/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1920. Dep: 05/01/1921.    
16/06/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1925. Dep: 31/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5026
   
20/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 21/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15)
   
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3501    
05/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3577    
06/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 16/11/1947.    
21/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63577
   
06/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949.    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
28/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950.    
23/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22205 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22130 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.    
26/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.    
17/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1960. Dep: 17/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22187 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960.    
23/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961.    
03/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63577 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev