Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 177 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 14081 Month
» 322062 Year
» 1206443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 69 m/e 12/1911
LNER (1924) 5069   14/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3502   07/04/1946
LNER (1947) 3580   09/02/1947
BR 63580 w/e 08/05/1948
War Dept. 043   22/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Tue 03/12/1963 off Gorton (9G)
Service Life 52 yrs , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Sold to WD 22/2/52. Renumbered 043. Sent to Egypt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 06/12/1918
IMM Immingham 20/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 24/12/1926
CLK Colwick 19/09/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 06/02/1949
ANN Annesley 18/12/1949
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn 03/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1911 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1436)
22/06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1505)
14/11/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)
22/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
13/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1026)
03/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
05/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
05/03/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
08/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3317)
18/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
05/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3301)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3389)
23/02/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22244)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1918 22/06/1918 127 days General
Boiler number 1505 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1920 01/01/1921 64 days General  
Gorton Works 03/03/1923 02/06/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 08/08/1925 14/11/1925 99 days General
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5069
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 24/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 22/03/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 13/08/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 03/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1938 05/03/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1941 08/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1943 18/09/1943 24 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1945 30/06/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 05/04/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 08/05/1948 1 day Light Repair
Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63580
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1949 06/08/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1952 23/02/1952 22 days General
Converted to Oil Fuel
Boiler number 22244 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 043
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 69
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1918. Dep: 22/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1505 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1918 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1920. Dep: 01/01/1921.    
03/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923.    
08/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5069
   
20/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.    
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 22/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
   
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
   
19/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3502    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3580    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
Renumbered to BR 63580
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Converted to Oil Fuel
Boiler number 22244 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 043
   
03/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 043 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev