Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 133 m/e 01/1912
LNER (1924) 5133   08/05/1925
LNER (1946) 3510   07/04/1946
LNER (1947) 3607   09/02/1947
BR (Tmp) E3607   08/02/1948
BR 63607 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 01/1912
Withdrawal Sun 05/09/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
Service Life 53 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to W. Heselwood, Attercliffe, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 19/01/1917
IMM Immingham 26/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 29/12/1926
IMM Immingham 16/09/1945
MEX Mexborough 07/07/1946
DON Doncaster 18/08/1946
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall 20/09/1953
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
40B Immingham 01/05/1960
40E Colwick 23/09/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 30/12/1962
40E Colwick 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1439)
03/12/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
08/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
18/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
25/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1093)
20/12/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1457)
29/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3296)
22/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
01/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
11/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3422)
25/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
04/08/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22206)
28/11/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22154)
02/06/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22109)
09/08/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22113)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 28/01/1920 03/12/1920 311 days General
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1922 19/02/1923 87 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1925 08/05/1925 87 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5133
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1928 08/02/1928 28 days General
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 18/08/1930 52 days General
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1933 25/02/1933 55 days General
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1935 20/12/1935 40 days General
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1939 25/02/1939 49 days General  
Stratford Works 03/05/1942 29/06/1942 58 days General
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1942 24/10/1942 63 days General  
Gorton Works 24/06/1944 22/07/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1946 01/06/1946 56 days General
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3510
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1948 08/02/1948 19 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3607
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1948 11/09/1948 39 days General
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63607
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1949 25/06/1949 24 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1951 04/08/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1951 17/08/1951 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/11/1953 28/11/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1956 02/06/1956 45 days General
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1958 09/08/1958 48 days General
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1960 04/02/1961 43 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 133
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/01/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 28/01/1920. Dep: 03/12/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1097 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 19/02/1923.    
11/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1925. Dep: 08/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5133
   
26/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1928. Dep: 08/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
   
28/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 18/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
   
02/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
08/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.    
03/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1942. Dep: 29/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
   
23/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3510
   
07/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3607    
21/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1948. Dep: 08/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3607
   
04/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63607
   
02/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
   
07/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
07/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22154 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
19/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
24/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1960. Dep: 04/02/1961.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63607 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev