Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 351 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 351 Week
» 17687 Month
» 295483 Year
» 1179864 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 155 m/e 02/1912
LNER (1924) 5155   07/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3511   20/01/1946
LNER (1947) 3608   23/02/1947
BR 63608 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 02/1912
Withdrawal Thu 25/05/1961 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 29/09/1922
MEX Mexborough 30/01/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 07/09/1944
DON Doncaster 03/02/1946
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 25/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/10/1947
WDN   25/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1441)
12/06/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1856)
07/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1331)
14/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1374)
23/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 819)
31/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
16/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3325)
05/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 945)
04/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3219)
06/07/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
04/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3314)
16/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22192)
13/06/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22146)
12/07/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22219)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/04/1920 12/06/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1922 12/08/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 07/02/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5155
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 03/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 14/12/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 23/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 31/08/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 16/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1941 05/07/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1944 04/03/1944 16 days General
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1946 06/07/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1948 04/12/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63608
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1951 16/06/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1953 13/06/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1955 09/07/1955 36 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 30/06/1956 11/08/1956 43 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 07/06/1958 12/07/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1961 20/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 155
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/04/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1920. Dep: 12/06/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1922. Dep: 12/08/1922.    
29/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1331 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5155
   
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.    
16/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 16/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
   
21/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3511    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
23/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3608    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
13/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63608
   
26/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
   
16/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955.    
30/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.    
07/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/05/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961.    
25/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63608 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev