Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 713 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4261 Week
» 5151 Month
» 313132 Year
» 1197513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 400 m/e 02/1912
LNER (1924) 5400   10/07/1926
LNER (1946) 3522   10/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3658   15/02/1947
BR 63658 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 02/1912
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 50 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 24/07/1919
MAR March 17/11/1933
CLK Colwick 29/12/1933
LNG Langwith Junction 21/02/1934
MAR March 27/11/1936
40E Langwith Junction 12/02/1950
40B Immingham 02/12/1951
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
39B Sheffield Darnall 18/07/1954
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1442)
11/05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1517)
10/07/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1850)
09/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1093)
11/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1490)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1203)
06/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1049)
24/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
14/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
12/02/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
13/04/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
04/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3333)
24/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1299)
20/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22226)
19/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22289)
21/06/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22144)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1917 11/05/1918 141 days General
Boiler number 1517 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 23/04/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 06/10/1923 134 days General  
Gorton Works 10/04/1926 10/07/1926 92 days General
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5400
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 14/04/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 12/07/1930 09/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1933 11/02/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1936 18/01/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1938 06/08/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 24/08/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1942 14/02/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1944 12/02/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 31/03/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/03/1946 13/04/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 04/09/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63658
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1950 24/06/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1952 20/09/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1955 19/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1958 21/06/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 400
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 11/05/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1517 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 23/04/1921.    
26/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 06/10/1923.    
10/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5400
   
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.    
12/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1203 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
27/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
23/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
   
24/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945.    
23/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3522    
15/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3658    
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3333 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63658
   
12/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3380 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
22/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
   
17/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1958. Dep: 21/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63658 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev