Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 403 m/e 03/1912
LNER (1924) 5403   08/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3524   13/10/1946
LNER (1947) 3660   06/02/1947
BR 63660 w/e 06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Mon 14/09/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 27/04/1917
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 11/08/1946
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn 14/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   14/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1444)
03/03/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1459)
15/04/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1460)
02/04/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1238)
24/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1878)
28/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1112)
19/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1861)
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
01/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
07/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
09/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
02/02/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22240)
05/05/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22209)
15/12/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22259)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/10/1916 03/03/1917 141 days General
Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1922 15/04/1922 57 days General
Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 08/11/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5403
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1926 02/04/1927 134 days General
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 24/08/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 28/11/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1934 19/05/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 29/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 01/10/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 07/12/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1942 16/01/1943 18 days General  
Darlington Works 26/07/1943 31/07/1943 6 days Light Repair
Damaged by enemy action. Barrel plates & rivets damaged.
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1944 09/12/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1947 07/06/1947 29 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1949 06/08/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63660
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1952 02/02/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1954 05/05/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1956 15/12/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1959 05/09/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 403
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/10/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1916. Dep: 03/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1459 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 15/04/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15)
   
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5403
   
20/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 02/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15)
   
07/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
   
30/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943.    
26/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Damaged by enemy action. Barrel plates & rivets damaged.
   
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3524    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3660    
10/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947.    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
02/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63660
   
12/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 05/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22259 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/09/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959.    
14/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63660 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev