Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 404 m/e 03/1912
LNER (1924) 5404   14/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3525   10/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3664   05/02/1947
BR 63664 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 1/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/11/1919
WFD Woodford Halse 08/07/1929
KEA Keadby 10/10/1929
IMM Immingham 01/11/1930
WFD Woodford Halse 04/03/1931
WHL West Hartlepool 02/09/1942
NPT Newport (Teeside) 05/10/1944
WHL West Hartlepool 18/10/1944
HLS Hull Springhead 02/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates 29/04/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 40B Immingham 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
04/08/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1460)
17/12/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1539)
14/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
30/07/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
18/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 514)
23/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1389)
23/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1019)
13/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
28/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1342)
03/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
25/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
20/04/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3430)
08/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3349)
24/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22229)
05/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22181)
28/07/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22177)
24/01/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted
24/01/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22892)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 24/03/1917 04/08/1917 134 days General
Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1921 17/12/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1924 14/06/1924 43 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5404
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1927 30/07/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1929 09/02/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 04/10/1930 18/10/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 23/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1935 23/02/1935 23 days General
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1937 13/03/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1939 28/10/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1941 03/01/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1944 25/03/1944 13 days General
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1946 20/04/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1948 08/05/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63664
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1949 22/10/1949 22 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 03/11/1951 24/11/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22229 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1953 05/12/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1956 28/07/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1958 24/01/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 404
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/03/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1917. Dep: 04/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1460 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1921. Dep: 17/12/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5404
   
14/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1927. Dep: 30/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1929. Dep: 09/02/1929.    
08/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
04/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
   
01/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
04/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
   
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1941. Dep: 03/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
13/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
02/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3430 (Diagram 15)
   
29/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3525    
05/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3664    
24/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63664
   
01/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/10/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22229 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63664 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev