|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/10/1919 | 13/12/1919 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1922 | 13/05/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1923 | 29/12/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5405 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1932 | 12/03/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1941 | 27/12/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63669 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1950 | 11/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1959 | 16/11/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Works Sidings) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 405 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
17/03/1917 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/10/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 13/12/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5405 |
||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
18/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. | ||
30/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
16/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3526 | ||
04/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3669 | ||
13/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63669 |
||
28/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 16/11/1959. | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
05/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. | ||
14/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63669 from Mexborough (41F) |