Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 856 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4404 Week
» 5294 Month
» 313275 Year
» 1197656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 405 m/e 04/1912
LNER (1924) 5405   09/04/1927
LNER (1946) 3526   16/10/1946
LNER (1947) 3669   04/02/1947
BR 63669 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/104/1912
O4/706/04/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 04/1912
Withdrawal Mon 14/11/1960 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 17/03/1917
DON Doncaster 21/07/1924
NWE New England 05/11/1929
CLK Colwick 14/10/1935
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
IMM Immingham 09/12/1945
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
FRO Frodingham 26/05/1946
36D Barnsley 02/03/1952
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
   Withdrawn 14/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   14/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1445)
13/12/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
13/05/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
29/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1466)
09/04/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
09/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1448)
12/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
03/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1350)
08/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1274)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
06/04/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3664)
27/12/1941 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3681)
14/08/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3662)
13/10/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3661)
10/01/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3668)
25/06/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3683)
11/11/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22307)
30/05/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22312)
29/12/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22322)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 13/12/1919 57 days General
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1922 13/05/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1923 29/12/1923 64 days General
Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1927 09/04/1927 71 days General
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5405
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 09/11/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 12/03/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 03/06/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1935 08/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1937 02/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1940 06/04/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1941 27/12/1941 27 days General
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1942 31/10/1942 18 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/07/1943 14/08/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1945 13/10/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 10/01/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1949 25/06/1949 19 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63669
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1950 11/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1953 30/05/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1959 16/11/1959 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/11/1960 05/11/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 405
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/03/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/10/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 13/12/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
   
25/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5405
   
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
   
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
   
25/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942.    
30/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3526    
04/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3669    
13/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63669
   
28/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 11/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
09/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 16/11/1959.    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
05/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960.    
14/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63669 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev