Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 177 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 14081 Month
» 322062 Year
» 1206443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 406 m/e 05/1912
LNER (1924) 5406   09/04/1926
LNER (1946) 3527   27/10/1946
LNER (1947) 3671   02/02/1947
BR 63671 w/e 12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 340
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal Sun 13/06/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 7/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 11/05/1917
DON Doncaster 21/07/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 05/03/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 03/08/1943
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1446)
06/12/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
28/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
16/01/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1506)
09/04/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1114)
01/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1746)
04/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 866)
23/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1851)
05/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
14/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
16/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3417)
16/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
17/06/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3257)
17/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22270)
03/07/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22163)
06/04/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22194)
22/12/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22256)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 06/12/1919 50 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1921 28/02/1922 116 days General
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 16/01/1924 61 days General
Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1926 09/04/1926 86 days General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5406
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1928 24/01/1929 67 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1930 01/01/1931 60 days General
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1933 04/03/1933 42 days General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1935 23/02/1935 34 days General
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1937 05/06/1937 55 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1939 14/10/1939 47 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 16/06/1942 16/08/1942 62 days General
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1944 16/12/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1947 17/06/1947 141 days General
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3671
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1949 12/11/1949 25 days General
Renumbered to BR 63671
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1949 23/11/1949 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/12/1950 13/01/1951 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/04/1952 17/05/1952 36 days General
Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1954 03/07/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1957 06/04/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1960 22/12/1960 43 days General
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 406
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/05/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/10/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 06/12/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1921. Dep: 28/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 16/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1506 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1926. Dep: 09/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5406
   
19/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1928. Dep: 24/01/1929.    
03/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1930. Dep: 01/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
22/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1851 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1942. Dep: 16/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
21/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3527    
28/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1947. Dep: 17/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3671
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
19/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63671
   
19/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949.    
14/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951.    
12/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63671 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev