Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 346 m/e 06/1912
LNER (1924) 5346   25/07/1925
War Dept. 767   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 767 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 20/09/1919
   Withdrawn 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1519)
25/03/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1523)
14/12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1440)
11/08/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 964)
14/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
31/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3353)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/01/1916 25/03/1916 64 days General
Boiler number 1523 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1918 14/12/1918 155 days General
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1920 12/02/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 05/05/1923 11/08/1923 99 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 25/07/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5346
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 14/04/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 31/05/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 31/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1935 12/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1938 05/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 767
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 346
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/01/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1916. Dep: 25/03/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1523 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1918. Dep: 14/12/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
25/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1920. Dep: 12/02/1921.    
05/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 25/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5346
   
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.    
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
22/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3353 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 767
   
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 767 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev