Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 347 m/e 06/1912
LNER (1924) 5347   05/06/1926
LNER (1946) 3513   18/08/1946
LNER (1947) 3617 on 07/02/1947
BR 63617 w/e 13/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Wed 12/12/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 1/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1912
MEX Mexborough on 10/06/1916
DON Doncaster on 20/10/1947
FRO Frodingham on 18/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 12/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   on 12/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1520)
26/02/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1600)
12/07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1536)
29/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
22/12/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1497)
05/06/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1120)
20/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
24/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)
10/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
07/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
03/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3404)
04/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3400)
06/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3432)
13/05/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3275)
26/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22279)
05/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22880)
14/09/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22256)
10/12/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22206)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton MPD Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. SLS/196102
30/04/1962 North Lindsey Light Railway At the end of April 04 63617 was on an iron ore train ex the branch. The 'lifted' section (Winterton-West Halton) has ore beds underneath it. SLS/196206

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/12/1915 26/02/1916 78 days General
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1918 12/07/1919 211 days General
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 29/10/1921 57 days General
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1923 22/12/1923 57 days General
Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1926 05/06/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5347
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 24/11/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 20/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1934 24/02/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1936 10/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 07/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1942 03/10/1942 11 days General
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1945 04/08/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1947 06/12/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1950 13/05/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63617
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1952 26/07/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1955 05/03/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1957 14/09/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1960 10/12/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 347
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
11/12/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1915. Dep: 26/02/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/12/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1918. Dep: 12/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5347
   
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928.    
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3513    
07/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3617    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63617
   
28/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63617 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev