|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/12/1915 | 26/02/1916 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1918 | 12/07/1919 | 211 days | General | Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 29/10/1921 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1926 | 05/06/1926 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5347 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1928 | 24/11/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1936 | 10/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63617 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1957 | 14/09/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton MPD | Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. | SLS/196102 |
30/04/1962 | North Lindsey Light Railway | At the end of April 04 63617 was on an iron ore train ex the branch. The 'lifted' section (Winterton-West Halton) has ore beds underneath it. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 347 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
11/12/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1915. Dep: 26/02/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1600 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1916 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/12/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1918. Dep: 12/07/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1536 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1497 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5347 |
||
13/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. | ||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3513 | ||
07/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3617 | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63617 |
||
28/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22279 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22256 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63617 from Frodingham (36C) |