Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 348 m/e 06/1912
LNER (1924) 5348   07/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3514   23/08/1946
LNER (1947) 3625   08/02/1947
BR 63625 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 06/1912
Withdrawal Thu 16/04/1959 off Barnsley (41G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 30/03/1917
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/09/1950
36D Barnsley 03/12/1950
   Withdrawn 16/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 36D Barnsley m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   16/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1521)
08/02/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1439)
01/10/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1866)
30/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1152)
09/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1305)
30/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
16/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1299)
17/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
03/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3307)
24/11/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
28/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3313)
26/01/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22239)
13/08/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22232)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 18/01/1920 08/02/1921 388 days General
Boiler number 1439 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1923 02/06/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 07/02/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5348
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 01/10/1927 99 days General
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 30/11/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1152 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 09/04/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 30/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 16/10/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1940 17/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1943 03/04/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1945 24/11/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 08/02/1947 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3625
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1948 28/08/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63625
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1952 26/01/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1955 13/08/1955 50 days General
Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1959 18/04/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 348
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/03/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 18/01/1920. Dep: 08/02/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1439 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923.    
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5348
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1152 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
   
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
   
23/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3514    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3625
   
31/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63625
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
12/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 26/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22239 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63625 from Barnsley (41G)    
18/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959.    

prev prev