Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 122 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7863 Week
» 28305 Month
» 365151 Year
» 1586716 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 349 m/e 07/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5349   03/12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3515   01/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3632 on 16/02/1947
British Railways 63632 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Thu 16/01/1964 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 51 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 5/3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1912
MEX Mexborough on 07/06/1919
ARD Ardsley on 23/09/1945
MEX Mexborough on 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction on 02/07/1950
41G Barnsley on 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough on 03/01/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn on 16/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 16/10/1947
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   on 16/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1522)
01/03/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1148)
28/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
03/12/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1086)
02/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1432)
10/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1009)
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
01/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3397)
30/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3304)
27/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3381)
25/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22131)
07/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22113)
24/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22293)
29/06/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22272)
25/05/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22290)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/11/1918 01/03/1919 106 days General
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1921 28/10/1921 119 days General
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1923 24/09/1923 101 days General  
Gorton Works 01/10/1925 03/12/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5349
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1928 22/11/1928 48 days General  
Gorton Works 21/03/1931 02/06/1931 74 days General
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1934 10/02/1934 37 days General
Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1936 29/08/1936 25 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1939 30/09/1939 63 days General
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1942 01/08/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1942 27/08/1942 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/08/1944 30/09/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1945 18/08/1945 34 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/07/1947 27/08/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1950 25/11/1950 30 days General
Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63632
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1953 07/02/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1953 26/02/1953 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/02/1955 24/03/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1957 29/06/1957 48 days General
Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1957 11/07/1957 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/04/1960 25/05/1960 50 days General
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 349
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/11/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1918. Dep: 01/03/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1921. Dep: 28/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1923. Dep: 24/09/1923.    
01/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1925. Dep: 03/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5349
   
06/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1928. Dep: 22/11/1928.    
21/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 02/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
30/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3397 (Diagram 15)
   
16/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1942. Dep: 27/08/1942.    
30/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
   
16/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.    
23/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3515    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3632    
09/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1947. Dep: 27/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
27/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63632
   
08/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
   
15/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1953. Dep: 26/02/1953.    
17/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 24/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957.    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
06/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1960. Dep: 25/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22290 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
16/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63632 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev