Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 350 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 5350   11/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3516   13/04/1946
LNER (1947) 3634   11/02/1947
BR 63634 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/107/1912
O4/727/01/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierly Hill, 6/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 07/06/1919
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
TUX Tuxford 18/12/1949
40E Langwith Junction 27/09/1953
40B Immingham 01/05/1960
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
ALLOC TUX Tuxford w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1523)
11/03/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1520)
11/01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1435)
21/07/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1441)
15/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
18/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1486)
24/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
05/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1221)
27/01/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3659)
08/05/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3671)
13/04/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3656)
19/06/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3685)
18/11/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22308)
04/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22346)
05/02/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22333)
20/04/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22331)
03/01/1959 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22349)
03/01/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/01/1916 11/03/1916 50 days General
Boiler number 1520 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1918 11/01/1919 162 days General
Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1921 12/03/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/04/1923 21/07/1923 106 days General
Boiler number 1441 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 11/04/1925 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5350
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1927 05/11/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1928 15/12/1928 92 days General
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1931 18/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 24/03/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1936 05/12/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1940 27/01/1940 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1943 08/05/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1946 13/04/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3516
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1948 19/06/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63634
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1950 18/11/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1955 05/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1955 22/10/1955 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/03/1957 20/04/1957 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1958 03/01/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 350
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/01/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1916. Dep: 11/03/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1520 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1918. Dep: 11/01/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 12/03/1921.    
07/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 21/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1441 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 11/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5350
   
24/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927.    
15/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 15/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
   
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3516
   
11/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3634    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63634
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
28/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D)
   
15/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.    
30/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
   
29/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1958. Dep: 03/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
01/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63634 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev