|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/01/1916 | 11/03/1916 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1520 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1918 | 11/01/1919 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1921 | 12/03/1921 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1923 | 21/07/1923 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1441 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 11/04/1925 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5350 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1927 | 05/11/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1928 | 15/12/1928 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1934 | 24/03/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1936 | 05/12/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1940 | 27/01/1940 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3516 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1948 | 19/06/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63634 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1950 | 18/11/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1958 | 03/01/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 350 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/01/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1916. Dep: 11/03/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1520 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1918. Dep: 11/01/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/06/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 12/03/1921. | ||
07/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 21/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1441 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 11/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5350 |
||
24/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927. | ||
15/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 15/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3516 |
||
11/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3634 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
04/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3685 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63634 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
28/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D) |
||
15/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. | ||
30/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D) |
||
29/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1958. Dep: 03/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
01/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63634 from Immingham (40B) |