|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/03/1921 | 23/04/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1923 | 22/09/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1926 | 01/05/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5351 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1929 | 18/05/1929 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1931 | 03/10/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/11/1942 | 10/12/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1943 | 11/09/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63635 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1951 | 28/04/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1955 | 07/01/1956 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1959 | 14/02/1959 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water Treatment fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1962 | 28/04/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 351 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
18/03/1915 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 23/04/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
28/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923. | ||
06/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 01/05/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5351 |
||
02/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1942. Dep: 10/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943. | ||
08/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3517 | ||
12/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3635 | ||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63635 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22180 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
26/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956. | ||
22/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment fitted |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
28/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/04/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962. | ||
09/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63635 from Langwith Junction (41J) |