Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 598 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 31471 Month
» 405484 Year
» 1627049 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 352 m/e 08/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5352   01/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3518   03/11/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3640 on 02/02/1947
British Railways 63640 w/e 26/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 08/1912 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 04/05/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/5/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 08/1912
IMM Immingham on 06/01/1924
KEA Keadby on 04/11/1930
FRO Frodingham on 12/06/1932
39B Sheffield Darnall on 01/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 04/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) on 20/04/1947
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   on 04/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1525)
18/01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
09/07/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1887)
10/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1471)
18/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 855)
06/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1151)
10/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
10/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1887)
10/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3254)
31/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
29/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3383)
17/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
26/11/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
28/06/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22173)
19/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22294)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/08/1918 18/01/1919 155 days General
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1921 09/07/1921 92 days General
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1923 10/11/1923 71 days General
Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1925 01/08/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5352
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1928 18/02/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 05/04/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 06/08/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1934 10/11/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 10/10/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1938 07/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1941 31/05/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1943 29/05/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1945 17/03/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1947 23/08/1947 29 days General  
Gorton Works 12/11/1949 26/11/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63640
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1950 18/03/1950 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/06/1952 28/06/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1955 19/02/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1956 07/04/1956 15 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1956 23/06/1956 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/10/1957 19/10/1957 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 352
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
17/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1918. Dep: 18/01/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 09/07/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1471 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5352
   
07/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1928. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930.    
04/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1887 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3518    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3640    
26/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947.    
12/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63640
   
11/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950.    
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
14/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22294 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1956. Dep: 07/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956.    
05/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.    
04/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63640 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev