Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 353 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 5353   05/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3519   16/06/1946
LNER (1947) 3643   23/02/1947
BR 63643 w/e 29/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O4/730/10/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Wed 30/11/1960 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 48 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 24/03/1922
KEA Keadby 06/01/1924
LIN Lincoln 07/12/1927
FRO Frodingham 02/12/1933
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
40E Langwith Junction 10/09/1950
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
40B Immingham 16/05/1960
   Withdrawn 30/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   30/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1526)
02/07/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1171)
28/01/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1524)
18/12/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1860)
11/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
01/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1416)
02/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
01/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
01/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
27/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3342)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3366)
30/10/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3689)
21/06/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3657)
29/10/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3695)
24/05/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22333)
28/08/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22327)
17/03/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22309)
28/05/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22312)
03/06/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/12/1916 02/07/1917 213 days General
Fitted with Pulveriser
Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1920 14/02/1920 36 days Light Repair
Altered back to coal burning
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1921 28/01/1922 36 days General
Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 05/07/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5353
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 18/12/1926 71 days General
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 11/05/1929 85 days General
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 01/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 02/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1936 01/02/1936 22 days General
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1938 27/08/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 25/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1943 30/10/1943 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 06/10/1945 8 days General  
Gorton Works 24/05/1947 21/06/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1949 29/10/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63643
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 15 days Light Casual
Tender repair only
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1952 24/05/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1953 16/05/1953 12 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 28/08/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1956 17/03/1956 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1957 28/05/1957 25 days General
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1958 15/03/1958 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/05/1959 03/06/1959 10 days Unclassified
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1960 26/11/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 353
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/12/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1916. Dep: 02/07/1917.
Work undertaken:
Fitted with Pulveriser
Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1920. Dep: 14/02/1920.
Work undertaken:
Altered back to coal burning
   
24/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1524 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5353
   
09/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D)
   
29/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3519    
23/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3643    
24/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
08/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63643
   
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
09/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender repair only
   
03/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22333 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.    
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22327 (Diagram 15D)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
25/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22309 (Diagram 15D)
   
04/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 28/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D)
   
08/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958.    
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
25/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
16/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/11/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960.    
30/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63643 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev