Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1027 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7416 Week
» 27858 Month
» 364704 Year
» 1586269 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 354 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5354   14/02/1925
War Dept. 724   10/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 29 yrs , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 724 and sent to Middle East via Birkenhead 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
GOR Gorton on 23/10/1912
MEX Mexborough on 30/01/1924
DON Doncaster on 09/01/1931
   Withdrawn on 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1527)
09/09/1916 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1438)
13/05/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1774)
14/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
23/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1274)
18/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
20/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
10/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1255)
09/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3370)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/05/1916 09/09/1916 106 days General
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1922 13/05/1922 43 days General
Boiler number 1774 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1924 14/02/1925 99 days General
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5354
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 04/08/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1930 23/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 10/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 18/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1937 20/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1939 10/06/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1941 09/08/1941 10 days General
Boiler number 3370 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 354
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/05/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1916. Dep: 09/09/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1774 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5354
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928.    
26/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
   
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
   
31/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3370 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 724 from Doncaster (DON)    
10/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 724    

prev prev