Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 809 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5917 Week
» 35415 Month
» 372261 Year
» 1593826 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 355 m/e 10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5355   21/08/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3521   31/08/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3654 on 17/01/1947
British Railways 63654 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 404
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Mon 22/06/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1912
GOR Gorton on 05/08/1921
MEX Mexborough on 09/02/1924
DON Doncaster on 06/01/1931
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 14/12/1937
WFD Woodford Halse on 11/08/1944
DON Doncaster on 03/02/1946
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 05/09/1947
36C Frodingham on 23/02/1958
   Withdrawn on 22/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 05/10/1947
WDN   on 23/04/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 28/03/1958
WDN   on 24/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1528)
25/01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
19/01/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 952)
21/08/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1746)
18/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1103)
25/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
30/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1853)
15/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
09/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3294)
11/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3269)
01/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
21/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3285)
02/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3373)
22/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22216)
19/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22149)
30/06/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22157)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/10/1918 25/01/1919 92 days General
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1921 25/06/1921 71 days General  
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 19/01/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 952 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1926 21/08/1926 113 days General
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5355
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 11/08/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/09/1930 18/10/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 25/02/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 30/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1937 15/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1939 09/12/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1942 11/07/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1944 01/04/1944 16 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 21/12/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1949 02/04/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63654
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1953 19/12/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1956 30/05/1956 5 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1959 27/06/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 355
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/10/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1918. Dep: 25/01/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921.    
05/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 952 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
01/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5355
   
30/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928.    
20/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
02/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15)
   
17/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
11/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3521    
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
   
17/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3654    
05/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
19/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63654
   
08/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22216 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1956. Dep: 30/05/1956.    
30/06/1956 Modification Diagram 15 number 22157 boiler fitted    
23/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
22/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63654 from Frodingham (36C)    
27/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/06/1959. Dep: 27/06/1959.    

prev prev