|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/10/1918 | 25/01/1919 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1921 | 25/06/1921 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1923 | 19/01/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 952 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1926 | 21/08/1926 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5355 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1928 | 11/08/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1933 | 25/02/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1935 | 30/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1937 | 15/05/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63654 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1956 | 30/05/1956 | 5 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1959 | 27/06/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 355 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/10/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1918. Dep: 25/01/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921. | ||
05/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 952 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5355 |
||
30/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928. | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1103 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3521 | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3654 | ||
05/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
19/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63654 |
||
08/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22216 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22149 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1956. Dep: 30/05/1956. | ||
30/06/1956 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 22157 boiler fitted | ||
23/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63654 from Frodingham (36C) | ||
27/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/06/1959. Dep: 27/06/1959. |