Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 920 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3059 Week
» 13229 Month
» 291025 Year
» 1175406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1183 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6183   14/03/1925
War Dept. 714   10/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4891
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Wed 10/09/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 714 and sent to Middle East via Glasgow 15/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 08/07/1912
MEX Mexborough 13/08/1912
   Withdrawn 10/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1449)
18/09/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1865)
25/06/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
19/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1059)
26/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1948)
26/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
06/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
05/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3365)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/07/1920 18/09/1920 64 days General
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1922 27/01/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 24/01/1925 14/03/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6183
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 25/06/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 28/09/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1932 19/03/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 26/01/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 26/06/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 06/01/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1941 05/07/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1183
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4891
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/07/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1920. Dep: 18/09/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.    
24/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6183
   
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929.    
12/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1948 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 714 from Mexborough (MEX)    
10/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 714    

prev prev