Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 945 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5076 Week
» 15246 Month
» 293042 Year
» 1177423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1184 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6184   08/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3531   22/12/1946
LNER (1947) 3680   16/02/1947
BR (Tmp) E3680   17/01/1948
BR 63680 w/e 29/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4892
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Wed 09/09/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 13/08/1912
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn 09/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
WDN   09/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1450)
19/07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1525)
15/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 179)
28/07/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1273)
01/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
19/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)
22/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
22/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
02/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3377)
31/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3315)
13/10/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
17/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
22/07/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1285)
08/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22877)
17/09/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22875)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1919 19/07/1919 127 days General
Boiler number 1525 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 15/10/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 01/12/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 08/08/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6184
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1928 28/07/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 01/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1933 19/08/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1936 22/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 02/09/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 05/02/1943 31/03/1943 55 days General
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1945 13/10/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1947 17/01/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3680
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1950 22/07/1950 36 days General
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63680
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1952 08/11/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1955 17/09/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1956 27/10/1956 15 days General
After collision
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1959 29/08/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1184
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4892
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/03/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1919. Dep: 19/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1525 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923.    
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6184
   
26/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
   
08/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1936. Dep: 22/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
12/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 31/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3531    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3680    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
20/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3680
   
17/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1950. Dep: 22/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63680
   
25/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22877 (Diagram 15)
   
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
29/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/08/1959. Dep: 29/08/1959.    
09/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63680 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev