Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1186 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6186   16/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3533   05/09/1946
LNER (1947) 3683   05/02/1947
BR 63683 w/e 28/04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/107/1912
O4/808/08/1953
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4894
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Sun 07/03/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 52 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Parkgate & Rawmarsh, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/08/1912
ARD Ardsley 28/12/1947
MEX Mexborough 22/02/1948
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
   Withdrawn 07/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   w/e 07/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1452)
17/03/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1509)
25/01/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1525)
26/02/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1528)
19/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1867)
13/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1072)
21/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
18/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
02/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3207)
25/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3302)
28/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22179)
08/08/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28802)
12/11/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28268)
16/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28890)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/11/1916 17/03/1917 120 days General
Boiler number 1509 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1921 25/01/1922 110 days General
Boiler number 1525 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 16/04/1924 68 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6186
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1926 26/02/1927 127 days General
Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 18/06/1929 53 days General  
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 19/11/1931 34 days General
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 13/10/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1936 21/11/1936 37 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1939 18/11/1939 40 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 11/10/1942 06/01/1943 88 days General  
Gorton Works 16/04/1945 02/06/1945 48 days General
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1947 25/11/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1951 28/04/1951 34 days General
Boiler number 22179 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63683
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1953 08/08/1953 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1955 12/11/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1957 21/09/1957 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/06/1958 16/08/1958 55 days General
Boiler number 28890 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1961 07/09/1961 37 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1186
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4894
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/11/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1916. Dep: 17/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1509 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1921. Dep: 25/01/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1525 (Diagram 15)
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 16/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6186
   
23/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1528 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 18/06/1929.    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 19/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
10/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1942. Dep: 06/01/1943.    
16/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3207 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3533    
05/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3683    
12/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1947. Dep: 25/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
22/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
26/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22179 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63683
   
15/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
06/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.    
23/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28890 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
02/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/08/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961.    
07/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63683 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev