Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1187 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6187   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3534   01/09/1946
LNER (1947) 3684   02/02/1947
BR 63684 w/e 18/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4895
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Thu 12/12/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/08/1912
DON Doncaster 20/10/1947
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
38A Colwick 18/03/1951
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
41A Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1962
41F Mexborough 20/01/1963
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22/09/1963
   Withdrawn 12/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   12/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1453)
15/05/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1853)
22/06/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
27/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
01/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1339)
21/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3290)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3381)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
20/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
18/03/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
09/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22282)
17/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22254)
28/12/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22298)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/02/1920 15/05/1920 78 days General
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 02/09/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 19/04/1924 21/06/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6187
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1927 22/06/1927 65 days General
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1929 17/05/1929 35 days General  
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 27/11/1931 42 days General
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1934 01/12/1934 33 days General
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1937 21/05/1937 50 days General
Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1939 02/12/1939 19 days General  
Gorton Works 25/09/1942 17/10/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1945 03/03/1945 54 days General
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1947 20/08/1947 53 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1950 18/03/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63684
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1952 09/08/1952 51 days General
Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1954 17/09/1954 54 days General
Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1957 28/12/1957 64 days General
Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1960 23/03/1960 48 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1187
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4895
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1920. Dep: 15/05/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.    
19/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6187
   
19/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1927. Dep: 22/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1929. Dep: 17/05/1929.    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 27/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 21/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3290 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.    
25/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3534    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3684    
29/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
21/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63684
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22282 (Diagram 15)
   
26/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22254 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
26/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1960. Dep: 23/03/1960.    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
20/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
12/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63684 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev