Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1188 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6188   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3535   17/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3690   07/02/1947
BR 63690 w/e 10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4896
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 50 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 27/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 16/08/1912
IMM Immingham 23/12/1945
FRO Frodingham 12/05/1946
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1454)
21/08/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1863)
28/06/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)
27/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
24/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)
11/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
13/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
13/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
15/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
20/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
11/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3385)
03/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3213)
10/09/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
15/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22250)
08/05/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22251)
08/12/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22235)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/07/1920 21/08/1920 43 days General
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1921 12/08/1922 457 days General  
Gorton Works 10/05/1924 28/06/1924 50 days General
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6188
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 15/08/1925 64 days General  
Gorton Works 17/12/1927 04/02/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 27/07/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1930 24/05/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1933 11/02/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 13/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1939 15/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1942 20/06/1942 9 days General
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1944 11/11/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1947 03/05/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1949 10/09/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63690
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1952 15/03/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1954 08/05/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1956 18/02/1956 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 27/10/1956 08/12/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1960 12/03/1960 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1188
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4896
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1920. Dep: 21/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1921. Dep: 12/08/1922.    
10/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6188
   
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925.    
17/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.    
15/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
26/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3535    
07/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3690    
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63690
   
23/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956.    
27/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 12/03/1960.    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63690 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev