|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/07/1920 | 21/08/1920 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1921 | 12/08/1922 | 457 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6188 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1930 | 24/05/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1933 | 11/02/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1939 | 15/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63690 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1960 | 12/03/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1188 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4896 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1920. Dep: 21/08/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1921. Dep: 12/08/1922. | ||
10/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6188 |
||
13/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. | ||
17/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3385 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3535 | ||
07/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3690 | ||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3213 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63690 |
||
23/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22251 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
27/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1960. Dep: 12/03/1960. | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63690 from Frodingham (36C) |