Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1189 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6189   22/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3536   06/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3692   09/02/1947
BR 63692 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4897
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Sun 14/02/1965 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 52 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnnot Young, Parkgate & Rawmarsh, 4/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 20/08/1912
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
DON Doncaster 18/12/1949
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
40E Colwick 23/09/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 30/12/1962
   Withdrawn 14/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham 04/10/1947
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 40B Immingham m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   w/e 14/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1455)
02/09/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1001)
22/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
23/04/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1438)
29/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)
18/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1862)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3305)
30/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3323)
02/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3399)
25/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
21/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22177)
16/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22161)
15/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22113)
05/07/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22236)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/05/1922 02/09/1922 106 days General
Boiler number 1001 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1924 22/08/1924 77 days General
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6189
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1927 23/04/1927 76 days General
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1929 11/07/1929 34 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1931 29/12/1931 57 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1934 18/01/1935 50 days General
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1937 28/08/1937 21 days General
Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1939 09/12/1939 21 days General  
Gorton Works 25/12/1942 30/01/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1946 02/03/1946 42 days General
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1948 25/09/1948 46 days General
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63692
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1951 21/04/1951 37 days General
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1952 22/03/1952 19 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/05/1953 16/05/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1955 15/10/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1955 24/12/1955 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/05/1958 05/07/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1959 02/09/1959 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/02/1960 01/04/1960 46 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/08/1961 16/09/1961 38 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1189
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4897
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1001 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1924. Dep: 22/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6189
   
07/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1927. Dep: 23/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1438 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929.    
03/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1931. Dep: 29/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1934. Dep: 18/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram 15)
   
08/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3305 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.    
25/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3536    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3692    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
04/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63692
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
16/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952.    
02/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22113 (Diagram 15)
   
10/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.    
29/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 02/09/1959.    
16/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960.    
10/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 16/09/1961.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
24/10/1964 Sightings A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed - Dead John Thickitt Link
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton): Dead on shed John Thickitt Link
14/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63692 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev