Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1190 m/e 07/1912
LNER (1924) 6190   20/12/1924
LNER (1946) 3537   14/06/1946
LNER (1947) 3693   01/02/1947
BR 63693 w/e 10/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4898
To Service During 07/1912
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 2/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 20/08/1912
FRO Frodingham 16/09/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
36B Mexborough 09/12/1951
36A Doncaster 22/03/1959
36C Frodingham 16/09/1962
   Withdrawn 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   25/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
02/02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1466)
04/03/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
03/11/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1952)
17/09/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
09/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
28/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
28/04/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
23/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
19/08/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
10/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3371)
10/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22162)
12/12/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22224)
19/10/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22880)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/08/1917 02/02/1918 169 days General
Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1922 04/03/1922 36 days General
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1923 03/11/1923 92 days General
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1924 20/12/1924 43 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6190
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 17/09/1927 85 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1929 08/06/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 09/09/1931 12 days General
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 28/04/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1940 23/03/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1942 10/10/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1944 19/08/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1947 10/05/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1951 10/02/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63693
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1951 17/11/1951 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1953 12/12/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1957 19/10/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1190
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4898
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1917. Dep: 02/02/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1466 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 04/03/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6190
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
29/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 09/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3537    
01/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3693    
12/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3371 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
27/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63693
   
10/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
09/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
21/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63693 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev