|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/06/1917 | 04/08/1917 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1921 | 03/12/1921 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1475 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1923 | 29/12/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 02/04/1927 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6192 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 13/12/1930 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1079 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3539 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 36 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63700 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1953 | 24/01/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1192 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4900 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
09/06/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1917. Dep: 04/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1921. Dep: 03/12/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1475 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1540 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 02/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6192 |
||
21/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1079 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1868 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
17/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3539 |
||
16/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3700 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3417 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63700 |
||
23/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
10/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1953. Dep: 24/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22887 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/12/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. | ||
20/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63700 from Gorton (9G) |