Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 751 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1791 Week
» 11961 Month
» 289757 Year
» 1174138 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1193 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6193   02/10/1924
LNER (1947) 3707   02/02/1947
LNER (1946) 3540   05/02/1947
BR 63707 m/e 31/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4901
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 52 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 18/09/1912
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
40B Immingham 16/05/1960
40E Colwick 23/09/1962
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1459)
15/12/1916 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1481)
07/10/1920 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1862)
02/10/1924 Diagram boiler fitted (number 588)
03/10/1929 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1953)
26/03/1932 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1076)
07/06/1935 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1095)
29/01/1938 Diagram boiler fitted (number 3316)
14/12/1940 Diagram boiler fitted (number 863)
02/01/1943 Diagram boiler fitted (number 3432)
23/06/1945 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1284)
13/01/1948 Diagram boiler fitted (number 943)
02/12/1950 Diagram boiler fitted (number 22136)
07/03/1953 Diagram boiler fitted (number 22114)
16/04/1955 Diagram boiler fitted (number 22889)
22/02/1958 Diagram boiler fitted (number 22279)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/11/1916 15/12/1916 30 days General
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1920 07/10/1920 21 days General
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1922 01/11/1922 82 days General  
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 02/10/1924 125 days General
Boiler number 588 (Diagram )
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6193
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1925 15/12/1925 61 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1927 23/02/1928 73 days General  
Gorton Works 05/07/1929 03/10/1929 91 days General
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1932 26/03/1932 28 days General
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1935 07/06/1935 66 days General
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1938 29/01/1938 23 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1940 14/12/1940 34 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1942 02/01/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1945 23/06/1945 53 days General
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1947 13/01/1948 45 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1950 02/12/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 22136 (Diagram )
Renumbered to BR 63707
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1953 07/03/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 22114 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1955 16/04/1955 45 days General
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1957 22/02/1958 61 days General
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1958 08/11/1958 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/09/1960 08/10/1960 27 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1193
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4901
Diagram boiler fitted
   
18/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/11/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1916. Dep: 15/12/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram )
   
17/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1920. Dep: 07/10/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1862 (Diagram )
   
12/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 01/11/1922.    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 02/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram )
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6193
   
16/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1925. Dep: 15/12/1925.    
13/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1927. Dep: 23/02/1928.    
05/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1929. Dep: 03/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram )
   
28/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1076 (Diagram )
   
03/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1935. Dep: 07/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram )
   
07/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram )
   
11/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram )
   
09/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram )
   
02/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram )
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3540    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3707    
30/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1947. Dep: 13/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram )
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
05/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22136 (Diagram )
Renumbered to BR 63707
   
12/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22114 (Diagram )
   
03/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram )
   
24/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 22/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22279 (Diagram )
   
11/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958.    
16/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63707 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev