|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/11/1916 | 15/12/1916 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1481 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1920 | 07/10/1920 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1862 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1922 | 01/11/1922 | 82 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1924 | 02/10/1924 | 125 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram ) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6193 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1925 | 15/12/1925 | 61 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1927 | 23/02/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1929 | 03/10/1929 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 1953 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1932 | 26/03/1932 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1076 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1935 | 07/06/1935 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 1095 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 23 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3316 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 863 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3432 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1284 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1947 | 13/01/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22136 (Diagram ) Renumbered to BR 63707 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22114 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1955 | 16/04/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22889 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1957 | 22/02/1958 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 22279 (Diagram ) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1958 | 08/11/1958 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1193 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4901 Diagram boiler fitted |
||
18/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/11/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1916. Dep: 15/12/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1481 (Diagram ) |
||
17/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1920. Dep: 07/10/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1862 (Diagram ) |
||
12/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 01/11/1922. | ||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 02/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram ) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6193 |
||
16/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1925. Dep: 15/12/1925. | ||
13/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1927. Dep: 23/02/1928. | ||
05/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1929. Dep: 03/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1953 (Diagram ) |
||
28/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1076 (Diagram ) |
||
03/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1935. Dep: 07/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1095 (Diagram ) |
||
07/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3316 (Diagram ) |
||
11/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 863 (Diagram ) |
||
09/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3432 (Diagram ) |
||
02/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1284 (Diagram ) |
||
02/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3707 | ||
05/02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3540 | ||
30/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1947. Dep: 13/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram ) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
05/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22136 (Diagram ) Renumbered to BR 63707 |
||
12/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22114 (Diagram ) |
||
03/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22889 (Diagram ) |
||
24/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 22/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22279 (Diagram ) |
||
11/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958. | ||
16/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63707 from Colwick (40E) |