|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/12/1920 | 22/01/1921 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1923 | 24/03/1923 | 64 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1925 | 16/05/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6195 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 07/01/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1251 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1932 | 10/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1935 | 18/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1942 | 07/03/1942 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1944 | 10/10/1944 | 67 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1949 | 01/07/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63711 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1951 | 03/12/1951 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1954 | 27/11/1954 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 65 days | Light Repair | Boiler REPAIRS: |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1962 | 10/08/1962 | 106 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1195 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4903 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
24/09/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1920. Dep: 22/01/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 24/03/1923. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6195 |
||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1251 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. | ||
03/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 10/10/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. | ||
15/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3542 | ||
20/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. | ||
27/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3711 | ||
07/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63711 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
11/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 03/12/1951. | ||
30/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954. | ||
30/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. | ||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
09/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler REPAIRS: |
||
12/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. | ||
27/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63711 from Annesley (16D) |