Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 577 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 30075 Month
» 366921 Year
» 1588486 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1195 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6195   16/05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3542   19/10/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3711 on 27/03/1947
British Railways 63711 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/109/1912
O110/10/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4903
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
MEX Mexborough on 24/09/1912
GOR Gorton on 15/10/1944
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1461)
22/01/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1870)
24/03/1923 Ross Pop
07/01/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1251)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1417)
18/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
29/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1038)
19/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3230)
07/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
10/10/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5009)
01/07/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5015)
24/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28362)
31/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28339)
07/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28284)
10/08/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28824)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/12/1920 22/01/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1923 24/03/1923 64 days General
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 16/05/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6195
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 07/01/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 1251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 03/05/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/12/1932 10/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 18/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 29/01/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 19/10/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1942 07/03/1942 15 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1944 10/10/1944 67 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1944 14/10/1944 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/10/1946 30/11/1946 42 days General  
Gorton Works 07/06/1949 01/07/1949 25 days General
Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63711
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1951 24/11/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1951 03/12/1951 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/09/1953 31/10/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1954 27/11/1954 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/03/1955 07/04/1955 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/11/1955 17/12/1955 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/11/1957 07/12/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1958 02/08/1958 65 days Light Repair
Boiler REPAIRS:
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1961 18/02/1961 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 27/04/1962 10/08/1962 106 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1195
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4903
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1920. Dep: 22/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 24/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop
   
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6195
   
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 07/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1251 (Diagram 15)
   
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.    
03/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3230 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 10/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.    
15/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3542    
20/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.    
27/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3711    
07/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63711
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
11/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 03/12/1951.    
30/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954.    
30/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.    
12/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955.    
09/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler REPAIRS:
   
12/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961.    
27/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63711 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev