Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 591 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3236 Week
» 5818 Month
» 270451 Year
» 1492016 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1196 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6196   17/04/1926
War Dept. 701   11/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4904
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Fri 12/09/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 29 yrs , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 701 and sent to Middle East via Birkenhead 11/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
GOR Gorton 19/09/1912
MEX Mexborough 26/09/1912
   Withdrawn 12/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
07/07/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1474)
24/12/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1496)
05/01/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1507)
20/10/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1413)
21/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1963)
03/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1952)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)
18/06/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
06/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3416)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1917 07/07/1917 113 days General
Boiler number 1474 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1921 24/12/1921 64 days General
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1923 05/01/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1507 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 17/04/1926 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6196
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1928 20/10/1928 92 days General
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 21/03/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1963 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1932 03/12/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 17/08/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1938 18/06/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1941 06/09/1941 23 days General
Boiler number 3416 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1196
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4904
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
19/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/03/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1917. Dep: 07/07/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1474 (Diagram 15)
   
22/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1921. Dep: 24/12/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1507 (Diagram 15)
   
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6196
   
21/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 20/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1963 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1952 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
15/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3416 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 701    
12/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 701 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev