Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 654 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4785 Week
» 14955 Month
» 292751 Year
» 1177132 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1197 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6197   02/08/1924
War Dept. 771   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4905
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 771 and sent to Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 04/07/1919
MEX Mexborough 01/05/1920
   Withdrawn 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1463)
28/02/1920 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1837)
01/10/1927 Diagram boiler fitted (number 814)
16/04/1932 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1953)
14/12/1935 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1150)
07/01/1939 Diagram boiler fitted (number 3359)
04/10/1941 Diagram boiler fitted (number 1951)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/11/1919 28/02/1920 92 days General
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1921 23/09/1922 464 days General  
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 02/08/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6197
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1927 01/10/1927 113 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 10/08/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 16/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 01/07/1933 50 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 14/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1938 07/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3359 (Diagram )
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram )
Renumbered to WD 771
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1197
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4905
Diagram boiler fitted
   
04/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/11/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1919. Dep: 28/02/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram )
   
01/05/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1921. Dep: 23/09/1922.    
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6197
   
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram )
   
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929.    
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1953 (Diagram )
   
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.    
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram )
   
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3359 (Diagram )
   
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1951 (Diagram )
Renumbered to WD 771
   
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 771 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev