Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1198 m/e 09/1912
LNER (1924) 6198   24/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3545   20/09/1946
LNER (1947) 3719   03/03/1947
BR 63719 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4906
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Tue 01/08/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 21/10/1912
DON Doncaster 18/08/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
   Withdrawn 01/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
22/09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1518)
11/02/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1474)
24/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
01/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
12/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1335)
27/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
31/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3209)
30/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
05/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3410)
23/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3275)
06/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3272)
25/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22133)
28/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22100)
28/01/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22890)
29/11/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22200)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1917 22/09/1917 92 days General
Boiler number 1518 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1921 11/02/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1474 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 24/05/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6198
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 04/12/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 02/03/1929 01/06/1929 92 days General
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 12/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 27/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 31/07/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1939 30/12/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1942 05/12/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1945 23/06/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1947 06/12/1947 54 days General
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1950 25/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63719
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 28/03/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1954 09/10/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/12/1955 28/01/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1956 11/08/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 01/11/1958 29/11/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1960 14/05/1960 8 days Light Casual
Tender change
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1961 29/07/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1198
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4906
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 22/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1518 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1474 (Diagram 15)
   
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6198
   
09/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 04/12/1926.    
02/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
19/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3545    
03/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3719    
14/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
11/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63719
   
22/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.    
14/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
25/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.    
24/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1955. Dep: 28/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956.    
01/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Tender change
   
29/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/07/1961. Dep: 29/07/1961.    
01/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63719 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev