Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 997 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7386 Week
» 27828 Month
» 364674 Year
» 1586239 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1199 m/e 09/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6199   07/04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3546   07/09/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) 3722 on 09/02/1947
British Railways 63722 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4907
To Service During 09/1912
Withdrawal Tue 24/09/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 51 yrs , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to ??, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1912
MEX Mexborough on 24/10/1912
LNG Langwith Junction on 13/01/1946
CLK Colwick on 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
39A Gorton on 26/11/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall on 29/08/1954
40D Tuxford on 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction on 01/02/1959
41G Barnsley on 29/11/1959
41F Mexborough on 03/01/1960
41J Langwith Junction on 28/02/1960
   Withdrawn on 24/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 41G Barnsley 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/03/1960
WDN   on 24/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1465)
12/10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1432)
07/04/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1205)
24/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1939)
28/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1399)
05/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
05/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3277)
25/07/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
02/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3294)
07/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
19/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3428)
23/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22145)
07/03/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22131)
17/03/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22176)
06/01/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22177)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/08/1918 12/10/1918 47 days General
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1920 19/01/1921 110 days General  
Gorton Works 03/02/1923 04/05/1923 91 days General  
Gorton Works 20/02/1925 07/04/1925 47 days General
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6199
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1928 28/03/1928 63 days General  
Gorton Works 26/04/1930 24/06/1930 60 days General
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1932 28/01/1933 48 days General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1936 05/06/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1939 18/03/1939 49 days General
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1942 25/07/1942 29 days General
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1944 02/12/1944 27 days General
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1945 29/12/1945 45 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/01/1947 07/04/1947 85 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3722
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1947 30/06/1947 35 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/01/1949 19/03/1949 67 days General
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63722
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1950 23/12/1950 23 days General
Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1950 02/01/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/05/1952 08/05/1952 3 days Weighing  
Gorton Works 09/02/1953 07/03/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1953 06/06/1953 3 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/06/1954 28/08/1954 81 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 04/02/1956 17/03/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1956 18/08/1956 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/12/1957 01/02/1958 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/11/1959 06/01/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1199
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4907
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1918. Dep: 12/10/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1432 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1920. Dep: 19/01/1921.    
03/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 04/05/1923.    
20/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1925. Dep: 07/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6199
   
26/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1928. Dep: 28/03/1928.    
26/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1932. Dep: 28/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1936. Dep: 05/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3277 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3294 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.    
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3546    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
13/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1947. Dep: 07/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3722
   
27/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1947. Dep: 30/06/1947.    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63722
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
01/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1950. Dep: 02/01/1951.    
06/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952.    
09/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22131 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953.    
09/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954.    
29/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
04/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956.    
17/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958.    
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (41G)    
30/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
28/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
24/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63722 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev