Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1038 Week
» 18374 Month
» 296170 Year
» 1180551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1200 m/e 10/1912
LNER (1924) 6200   14/03/1925
LNER (1946) 3547   14/09/1946
LNER (1947) 3723   23/02/1947
BR 63723 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4908
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Mon 09/11/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 24/10/1912
IMM Immingham 23/12/1945
GOR Gorton 12/05/1946
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 09/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   09/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1466)
25/08/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1539)
15/10/1921 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1939)
15/10/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
14/03/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1289)
21/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1263)
11/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1706)
11/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3251)
24/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
11/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1020)
14/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3373)
08/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3260)
08/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22212)
26/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22151)
07/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22134)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1917 25/08/1917 64 days General
Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 15/10/1921 15 days General
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1923 30/06/1923 99 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 14/03/1925 43 days General
Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6200
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 05/05/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/05/1930 21/06/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1933 11/03/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 11/07/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 12/08/1939 22 days General  
Gorton Works 06/10/1942 24/10/1942 19 days General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1944 11/11/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 14/09/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3547
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1948 08/01/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63723
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1953 26/09/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1955 22/01/1955 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/03/1956 07/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1959 09/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1200
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4908
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
24/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1539 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
24/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6200
   
24/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.    
24/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1706 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939.    
06/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1020 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3547
   
23/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3723    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63723
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 22/01/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
03/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 07/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63723 from Mexborough (41F)    
09/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 09/11/1959.    

prev prev