Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 465 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 465 Week
» 17801 Month
» 295597 Year
» 1179978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1201 m/e 10/1912
LNER (1924) 6201   29/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3548   15/09/1946
LNER (1947) 3727   06/04/1947
BR 63727 w/e 03/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 415X
Works Number 4909
To Service During 10/1912
Withdrawal Sat 01/02/1964 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 51 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 6/3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 01/11/1912
36D Barnsley 26/02/1950
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn 01/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   01/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1467)
17/09/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1462)
11/07/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1469)
29/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1448)
24/08/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1861)
06/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
10/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1298)
10/07/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
10/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
13/01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3209)
24/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
16/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
07/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3393)
06/05/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 801)
01/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22874)
03/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22886)
14/04/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22173)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/08/1917 17/09/1917 38 days General
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1922 11/07/1922 116 days General
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1924 29/08/1924 84 days General
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6201
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1927 24/08/1927 52 days General
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 11/06/1929 46 days General  
Gorton Works 05/09/1931 06/10/1931 32 days General
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1934 10/11/1934 38 days General
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1937 10/07/1937 41 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1939 13/01/1940 44 days General
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1943 24/04/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1945 16/06/1945 56 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1947 07/08/1947 179 days General
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3727
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1949 03/12/1949 36 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 63727
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1950 06/05/1950 35 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1952 01/11/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1952 07/11/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/10/1955 03/12/1955 38 days General
Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1960 14/04/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1201
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4909
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/11/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/08/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1917. Dep: 17/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1922. Dep: 11/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15)
   
07/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1924. Dep: 29/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6201
   
04/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1927. Dep: 24/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929.    
05/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 06/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
   
04/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
   
31/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
01/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3548    
10/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1947. Dep: 07/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3727
   
29/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63727
   
26/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
02/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952.    
27/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
08/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63727 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev