Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1203 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6203   17/01/1925
LNER (1946) 3550   13/10/1946
LNER (1947) 3736   02/02/1947
BR 63736 w/e 08/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19859
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Thu 29/08/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 51 yrs , 29 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 30/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 27/08/1912
LNG Langwith Junction 15/01/1926
IMM Immingham 29/01/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 28/02/1931
DON Doncaster 16/04/1941
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 12/12/1943
   Withdrawn 29/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   29/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1469)
08/03/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1526)
01/09/1920 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1861)
31/05/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
17/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1236)
20/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
20/12/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
01/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
03/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3221)
23/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
17/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
08/10/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3301)
15/12/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22233)
29/04/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22228)
16/03/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22140)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/02/1917 08/03/1917 16 days General
Boiler number 1526 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1920 01/09/1920 40 days General
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1922 18/10/1922 96 days General  
Gorton Works 18/11/1924 17/01/1925 61 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6203
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1927 31/05/1927 79 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1929 06/04/1929 55 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1930 17/02/1931 79 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1933 22/07/1933 41 days General
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1935 20/12/1935 40 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1938 23/07/1938 51 days General
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1938 26/11/1938 51 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/01/1941 01/03/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1943 03/07/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1945 23/06/1945 55 days General
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/09/1947 17/10/1947 41 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1949 08/10/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63736
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1951 15/12/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1954 29/04/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1954 04/05/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/02/1957 16/03/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1957 20/03/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/05/1960 01/07/1960 33 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1203
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19859
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/08/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/02/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1917. Dep: 08/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1526 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1920. Dep: 01/09/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1922. Dep: 18/10/1922.    
18/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6203
   
15/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
29/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1927. Dep: 31/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929.    
01/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1930. Dep: 17/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
12/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
03/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938.    
24/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
   
16/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
30/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3550    
02/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3736    
07/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63736
   
15/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15)
   
02/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1954. Dep: 04/05/1954.    
08/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
   
19/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957.    
30/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960.    
29/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63736 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev