Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 619 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4357 Week
» 1870 Month
» 229754 Year
» 1451319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1205 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6205   16/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3552   22/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3738 on 16/02/1947
BR 63738 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O4/824/06/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19861
To Service During 08/1912 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to TW Ward, Beighton, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) m/e 08/1912
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 18/07/1942
LNG Langwith Junction 03/08/1943
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
IMM Immingham 18/12/1949
40E Colwick 23/09/1962
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 30/12/1962
36A Doncaster 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1471)
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1495)
19/06/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
22/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1885)
27/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1378)
03/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
29/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1162)
02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3318)
07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1399)
07/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3202)
24/06/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5016)
19/05/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5019)
09/12/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28802)
07/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28392)
04/06/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28826)
01/09/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28882)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/01/1918 03/1918   General
Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1922 19/06/1922 42 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1924 16/05/1924 11 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6205
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1926 23/09/1926 10 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 22/12/1928 22 days General
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1930 27/12/1930 8 days General
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 03/06/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1935 29/11/1935 9 days General
Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1938 01/02/1938   General
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1940 07/1940   General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1942 03/1942   General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1944 24/06/1944 54 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5016 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1946 06/04/1946 47 days General  
Gorton Works 06/04/1948 19/05/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63738
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1950 09/12/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1950 19/12/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/01/1953 07/02/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1955 04/06/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1957 01/11/1957 42 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/11/1958 15/11/1958 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 31/07/1961 01/09/1961 33 days General
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1205
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19861
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/01/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1918. Dep: 00/03/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
   
09/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1922. Dep: 19/06/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1924. Dep: 16/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6205
   
14/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1926. Dep: 23/09/1926.    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 29/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15)
   
1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1938. Dep: 01/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15)
   
1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1940. Dep: 00/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1942. Dep: 00/03/1942.    
07/03/1942 Modification Diagram 15 number 3202 boiler fitted    
18/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
02/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5016 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3552    
16/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3738    
06/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1948. Dep: 19/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63738
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 19/12/1950.    
12/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28392 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 01/11/1957.    
07/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958.    
31/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 01/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63738 from Doncaster (36A)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev