Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 465 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 465 Week
» 17801 Month
» 295597 Year
» 1179978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1206 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6206   07/02/1925
LNER (1946) 3553   01/01/1947
LNER (1947) 3743   02/03/1947
BR 63743 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19862
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/06/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 49 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/6/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GRI Grimsby 07/09/1912
KEA Keadby m/e 1920
IMM Immingham 24/04/1924
MAR March 01/03/1929
LNG Langwith Junction 19/02/1934
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 20/10/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1472)
04/1917 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1452)
07/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
29/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1269)
06/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1303)
14/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1010)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
07/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
26/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1308)
20/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
13/09/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
18/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3281)
13/10/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22218)
02/01/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22191)
25/08/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22199)
31/01/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22882)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1917 04/1917   General
Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1920 22/05/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 03/06/1922 30/09/1922 120 days General  
Gorton Works 08/11/1924 07/02/1925 92 days General
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6206
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1926 15/01/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 29/12/1928 99 days General
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1930 06/12/1930 15 days General
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 14/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1936 07/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1938 26/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 19/10/1940 15 days General  
Gorton Works 18/12/1942 02/01/1943 16 days General  
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 20/01/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1947 13/09/1947 15 days General
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1949 18/06/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63743
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1951 13/10/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1953 02/01/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1956 25/08/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1959 31/01/1959 29 days General
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 1206
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19862
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Grimsby (GRI)    
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/04/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15)
   
1920 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
27/03/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1920. Dep: 22/05/1920.    
03/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922.    
24/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
08/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6206
   
13/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
22/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 29/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
12/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.    
18/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3553    
02/03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3743    
30/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3281 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63743
   
20/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22218 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1953. Dep: 02/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22199 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1959. Dep: 31/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22882 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63743 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev