Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 482 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4220 Week
» 1733 Month
» 229617 Year
» 1451182 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1207 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 6207   18/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3554   10/11/1946
LNER (1947) 3745 on 26/02/1947
BR 63745 w/e 07/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/108/1912
O4/518/06/1932
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L496
Works Number 19863
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Thu 16/04/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
GRI Grimsby 13/09/1912
MEX Mexborough 19/01/1917
MAR March 02/03/1929
CLK Colwick 05/02/1934
LNG Langwith Junction 04/01/1937
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
40B Immingham 07/06/1953
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 16/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   16/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1912 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
15/06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
28/04/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 139)
18/04/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1463)
01/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1404)
18/06/1932 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 621)
28/03/1936 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 615)
25/12/1937 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 639)
13/04/1940 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)
09/01/1943 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1084)
28/07/1945 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 621)
30/08/1947 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1918 15/06/1918 134 days General
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1920 27/11/1920 43 days General  
Gorton Works 03/02/1923 28/04/1923 85 days General
Boiler number 139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 18/04/1925 50 days General
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6207
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1928 14/07/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 01/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1932 18/06/1932 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1934 10/03/1934 29 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 28/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1937 25/12/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 13/04/1940 50 days General
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1942 09/01/1943 24 days General
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 28/07/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 30/08/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1949 07/01/1950 22 days General
Renumbered to BR 63745
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1952 26/07/1952 43 days General  
Gorton Works 01/01/1955 12/02/1955 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/04/1959 18/04/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1207
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19863
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/09/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Grimsby (GRI)    
19/01/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/02/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1918. Dep: 15/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1920. Dep: 27/11/1920.    
03/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 139 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6207
   
09/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 14/07/1928.    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
   
05/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934.    
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
   
04/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 25/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15A)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
   
17/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
   
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15A)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3554    
26/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3745    
09/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
17/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63745
   
14/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
16/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63745 from Mexborough (41F)    
18/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959.    

prev prev